NY S06600 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 6600A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 6600A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certificates of registration for entities that manufacture or assemble zero emissions vehicles; authorizes 20 certificates with at least five to be located in certain upstate regions.
Title
Relates to certificates of registration for entities that manufacture or assemble zero emissions vehicles; authorizes 20 certificates with at least five to be located in certain upstate regions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6600A |
2018-02-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08248 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 8248a