NY S06598 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes and validates certain acts and proceedings of the village board of trustees of the village of Silver Springs, Wyoming county, in relation to the issuance of certain bond anticipation notes.
Title
Legalizes and validates certain acts and proceedings of the village board of trustees of the village of Silver Springs, Wyoming county, in relation to the issuance of certain bond anticipation notes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.383 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.603 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8980a |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-05-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6598B |
2014-04-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6598A |
2014-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.314 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08980 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6598b