NY S06593 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Erie county to waive certain fees for veterans' organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Erie county to waive certain fees for veterans' organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.668
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8362
2019-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1804
2019-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08362 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6593

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback