NY S06590 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5461B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5461B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Flanders, Riverside and Northampton Community Association, Inc. to file an application for a partial exemption from real property taxes for the 2019-2020 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes the Flanders, Riverside and Northampton Community Association, Inc. to file an application for a partial exemption from real property taxes for the 2019-2020 assessment roll.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5461B |
2021-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1700 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6590A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05461 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - signed chap.324