NY S06584 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to activities by former state officers; permits certain state officers, terminated between January 1, 2009 and April 1, 2014 due to a reduction in the state workforce, to engage in certain activities representing any entity before a state agency or board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to activities by former state officers; permits certain state officers, terminated between January 1, 2009 and April 1, 2014 due to a reduction in the state workforce, to engage in certain activities representing any entity before a state agency or board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.485
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.704
2012-06-04Assemblysubstituted for a9372
2012-05-02Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2012-05-02SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-05-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-04-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-04-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.588
2012-03-01SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A09372 (Same As) 2012-06-04 - substituted by s6584

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback