NY S06579 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for vacating records for certain proceedings and modifies the definition of smoking.
Title
Provides for vacating records for certain proceedings and modifies the definition of smoking.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.131 |
2019-07-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.669 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8420a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1839 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6579A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08420 (Same As) 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.131