NY S06566 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to development or redevelopment of Pier 40 in the Hudson river park and amount of passive and active public open space necessary for such development or redevelopment.
Title
Relates to development or redevelopment of Pier 40 in the Hudson river park and amount of passive and active public open space necessary for such development or redevelopment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.290 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.615 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8351 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1802 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08351 (Same As) 2019-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.290