NY S06551 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7966C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7966C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the amount of the supplemental basic tuition for charter schools.
Title
Relates to the amount of the supplemental basic tuition for charter schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7966C |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1454 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6551C |
2018-03-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6551B |
2018-01-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2218 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6551A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07966 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled