NY S06550 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6707A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6707A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of North Collins as the "Tec. 5 Edward Enser Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of North Collins as the "Tec. 5 Edward Enser Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6707A |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1786 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6550A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06707 (Same As) 2021-07-23 - signed chap.308