NY S06550 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund and the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund and the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9125 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6550A |
2016-02-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.105 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A09125 (Same As) 2016-08-19 - signed chap.255