NY S06549 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from applicants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from applicants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10AssemblySIGNED CHAP.94
2019-07-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.355
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a5308b
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1588
2019-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A05308 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6549

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback