NY S06548 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Collins, county of Erie, as the "Staff Sergeant Peter J. Blidy Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Collins, county of Erie, as the "Staff Sergeant Peter J. Blidy Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.477 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.664 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a6345 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1566 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06345 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6548