NY S06545 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the issuance of certificates of insurance and requires the issuance of a certificate of insurance as a summary or evidence of property or casualty insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the issuance of certificates of insurance and requires the issuance of a certificate of insurance as a summary or evidence of property or casualty insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.97
2014-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a9590
2014-05-19Assemblyreferred to insurance
2014-05-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-05-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-05-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6545A
2014-02-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-02-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-02-10Senate1ST REPORT CAL.150
2014-02-04SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A09590 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - substituted by s6545a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback