NY S06543 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the governor and senior state officers to appear before the legislature as requested by the legislature to publicly explain actions and answer questions.
Title
Requires the governor and senior state officers to appear before the legislature as requested by the legislature to publicly explain actions and answer questions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-06-11 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-21 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08117 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary