NY S06542 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes limitations on newborn screening for glucose-6-phosphate dehydrogenase deficiency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes limitations on newborn screening for glucose-6-phosphate dehydrogenase deficiency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-22SenateVETOED MEMO.143
2023-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.866
2023-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7338
2023-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1527
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-17SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-04-26SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A07338 (Same As) 2023-06-20 - substituted by s6542

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback