NY S06539 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6539A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6539A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides accidental disability retirement benefits for deputy sheriff Richard Stueber, a participant in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, and cleanup operations.
Title
Provides accidental disability retirement benefits for deputy sheriff Richard Stueber, a participant in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, and cleanup operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6539A |
2022-05-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07626 (Same As) 2022-05-13 - print number 7626a