NY S06532 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits kelp cultivation in underwater lands at Gardiner's and Peconic bays; permits Suffolk county to lease lands under water ceded to it by the state for the purpose of kelp cultivation; modifies certain provisions regarding commercial fishing licenses; makes related provisions.
Title
Permits kelp cultivation in underwater lands at Gardiner's and Peconic bays; permits Suffolk county to lease lands under water ceded to it by the state for the purpose of kelp cultivation; modifies certain provisions regarding commercial fishing licenses; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-07 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.56 |
2021-12-07 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.656 |
2021-11-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.610 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7547a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6532A |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.984 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07547 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6532a