NY S06526 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of social adult day services to include community or home settings which are pursuant to a person-centered service plan.
Title
Amends the definition of social adult day services to include community or home settings which are pursuant to a person-centered service plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.296 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.254 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a7499 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.992 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A07499 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - substituted by s6526