NY S06525 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes Stewart International Airport in the definition of covered airport location for the purposes of minimum wage rates.
Title
Includes Stewart International Airport in the definition of covered airport location for the purposes of minimum wage rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.106 |
2022-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.212 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a8822 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1082 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2021-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08822 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s6525