NY S06521 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of electronic signatures on funeral and cemetery services documents.
Title
Authorizes the use of electronic signatures on funeral and cemetery services documents.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Mike Martucci [R] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.222 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.233 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a7301 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1158 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A07301 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - substituted by s6521