NY S06520 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6520A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6520A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that combination gas and electric corporations must file with the public service commission an application to establish a tariff for the purpose of purchasing electricity that is 100% from renewable energy.
Title
Provides that combination gas and electric corporations must file with the public service commission an application to establish a tariff for the purpose of purchasing electricity that is 100% from renewable energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6520A |
2018-01-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06720 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - amended on third reading 6720a