NY S06508 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Nassau to accept an application for retroactive real property exemption from the First Reformed Church of Jamaica for a certain parcel in Hempstead.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Nassau to accept an application for retroactive real property exemption from the First Reformed Church of Jamaica for a certain parcel in Hempstead.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.687
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a6923c
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2019-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1731
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 6508A
2019-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2019-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A06923 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6508a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback