NY S06502 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of glyphosate on state property.
Title
Prohibits the use of glyphosate on state property.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.70 |
2020-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.378 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.220 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | substituted for a732b |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.797 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6502A |
2020-07-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00732 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70