NY S06499 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.266
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.266
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excepts certain lands required for above-ground appurtenances from the requirement that easements sold or conveyed in certain park lands in the village of Mamaroneck be continued to be used for park purposes.
Title
Excepts certain lands required for above-ground appurtenances from the requirement that easements sold or conveyed in certain park lands in the village of Mamaroneck be continued to be used for park purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.266 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.656 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a8090b |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2136 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6499B |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6499A |
2017-06-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08090 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6499b