NY S06493 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adjudications and owner liability for a violation of traffic-control signal indications in the county of Westchester.
Title
Relates to adjudications and owner liability for a violation of traffic-control signal indications in the county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6493A |
2020-07-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.679 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8287 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1643 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08287 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES