NY S06486 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of mental health to issue a report on short term crisis respite programs and intensive crisis respite programs.
Title
Requires the commissioner of mental health to issue a report on short term crisis respite programs and intensive crisis respite programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.143 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1641 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6486 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.212 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.212 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Senate | referred to mental health |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8014 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1641 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08014 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - tabled