NY S06474 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the duration of certain leases or agreements relating to the sale of food and beverages at Rye town park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the duration of certain leases or agreements relating to the sale of food and beverages at Rye town park.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.325
2017-09-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.516
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7987
2017-06-15Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-15SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2017-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1740
2017-06-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-24SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07987 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6474

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback