NY S06473 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Long Island water utility reform act"; relates to the assessment of property owned by water-works corporations; establishes the Nassau county water authority.
Title
Enacts the "Long Island water utility reform act"; relates to the assessment of property owned by water-works corporations; establishes the Nassau county water authority.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.868 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07963 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions