NY S06460 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing certain members, upon retirement, to use any basic or additional member contributions to offset any deficits in such other contribution account; relates to the definition of additional member contributions and basic member contributions for certain New York city employees' retirement system members who are subject to certain retirement plans under articles 14 and 15 of the retirement and social security law; allows such additional member contributions to be used to offset a deficit of basic member contributions or to allow an excess of basic member contributions to offset a deficit of additional member contributions upon retirement.
Title
Relates to allowing certain members, upon retirement, to use any basic or additional member contributions to offset any deficits in such other contribution account; relates to the definition of additional member contributions and basic member contributions for certain New York city employees' retirement system members who are subject to certain retirement plans under articles 14 and 15 of the retirement and social security law; allows such additional member contributions to be used to offset a deficit of basic member contributions or to allow an excess of basic member contributions to offset a deficit of additional member contributions upon retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.467 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.619 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a8055 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1766 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08055 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6460