NY S06457 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of transportation to conduct a traffic and planning study on the feasibility of transforming the Harriman campus in connection with the relocation of the Wadsworth Laboratory at Harriman; directs a report on the findings of such study to be delivered within one year of effectiveness.
Title
Directs the department of transportation to conduct a traffic and planning study on the feasibility of transforming the Harriman campus in connection with the relocation of the Wadsworth Laboratory at Harriman; directs a report on the findings of such study to be delivered within one year of effectiveness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1199 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1689 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05888 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to transportation