NY S06450 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the investigation of illegally operating child day care services, including the review process of applicable advertisements.
Title
Relates to the investigation of illegally operating child day care services, including the review process of applicable advertisements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1670 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02474 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to children and families