NY S06448 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.277
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.277
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to improving evaluations of the potential impact of rules on jobs and employment opportunities.
Title
Relates to improving evaluations of the potential impact of rules on jobs and employment opportunities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.277 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.448 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a9347a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6448A |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.886 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A09347 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6448a