NY S06447 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9274B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for more effective review of existing rules; requires more frequent review of certain rules and publication of agencies which fail to review rules; extends certain provisions relating to the state register.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for more effective review of existing rules; requires more frequent review of certain rules and publication of agencies which fail to review rules; extends certain provisions relating to the state register.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A9274B
2012-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6447B
2012-05-30SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6447A
2012-05-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.771
2012-02-09SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A09274 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - signed chap.462

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback