NY S06438 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6438B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6438B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of court administration to publish annually on its website pretrial data and information related to pretrial detention.
Title
Requires the office of court administration to publish annually on its website pretrial data and information related to pretrial detention.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Brian Benjamin [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6438B |
2020-02-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6438A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1632 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08441 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means