NY S06435 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to utilization review program standards; requires use of evidence-based and peer reviewed clinical review criteria; relates to prescription drug formulary changes and pre-authorization for certain health care services.
Title
Relates to utilization review program standards; requires use of evidence-based and peer reviewed clinical review criteria; relates to prescription drug formulary changes and pre-authorization for certain health care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1334 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6435B |
2022-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1228 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6435A |
2021-05-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07129 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - print number 7129a