NY S06435 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - PRINT NUMBER 6435B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the "protect our privacy (POP) act" to impose limitations on the use of drones for law enforcement purposes; prohibits the use of drones by law enforcement at concerts, protests, demonstrations, or other actions protected by the first amendment and requires a search warrant prior to using a drone for law enforcement purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "protect our privacy (POP) act" to impose limitations on the use of drones for law enforcement purposes; prohibits the use of drones by law enforcement at concerts, protests, demonstrations, or other actions protected by the first amendment and requires a search warrant prior to using a drone for law enforcement purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 6435B
2020-06-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2019-10-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 6435A
2019-10-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2019-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09931 (Same As) 2020-07-09 - print number 9931a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback