NY S06426 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the service provider to successfully complete and submit to the Long Island power authority the results of an annual stress test of all systems that support outage and restoration management and communications; imposes a civil penalty of two hundred fifty thousand dollars for the failure to complete such stress test; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the service provider to successfully complete and submit to the Long Island power authority the results of an annual stress test of all systems that support outage and restoration management and communications; imposes a civil penalty of two hundred fifty thousand dollars for the failure to complete such stress test; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.228
2021-06-01Assemblysubstituted for a7236a
2021-06-01Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-06-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-05-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-05-10Senate1ST REPORT CAL.934
2021-05-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 6426A
2021-05-06SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2021-04-28SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07236 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - substituted by s6426a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback