NY S06426 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the sale and production of liquor by farm distilleries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the sale and production of liquor by farm distilleries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.484
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.314
2012-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a9863
2012-05-31Assemblyreferred to economic development
2012-05-31SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-05-31SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-05-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.770
2012-02-08SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A09863 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s6426

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback