NY S06425 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6425B
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6425B
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits non-compete agreements and certain restrictive covenants; authorizes employees to bring a civil action in a court of competent jurisdiction against any employer or persons alleged to have violated such prohibition.
Title
Prohibits non-compete agreements and certain restrictive covenants; authorizes employees to bring a civil action in a court of competent jurisdiction against any employer or persons alleged to have violated such prohibition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6425B |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2022-04-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6425A |
2022-04-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2021-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A09591 (Same As) 2022-05-20 - print number 9591a