NY S06419 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing the civil rights restoration act and amends provisions of law regarding firearm licenses and destruction of firearms; exempts certain individuals from providing photographs in order to obtain a firearm license; expands the definition of immediate family.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing the civil rights restoration act and amends provisions of law regarding firearm licenses and destruction of firearms; exempts certain individuals from providing photographs in order to obtain a firearm license; expands the definition of immediate family.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2017-05-17SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A06805 (Same As) 2017-10-11 - enacting clause stricken
A08909 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback