NY S06415 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes firefighters who are members of a fire company or department of another state to provide assistance to volunteer fire companies or departments in this state.
Title
Authorizes firefighters who are members of a fire company or department of another state to provide assistance to volunteer fire companies or departments in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.155 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.616 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7942 |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1075 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07942 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6415