NY S06412 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires trucks to utilize commercial GPS designed for use by a commercial vehicle which is able to provide audible and visual warnings when the truck is on a route where the height, weight, width, or length of the truck exceeds the limitations of such route when operating on public highways in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires trucks to utilize commercial GPS designed for use by a commercial vehicle which is able to provide audible and visual warnings when the truck is on a route where the height, weight, width, or length of the truck exceeds the limitations of such route when operating on public highways in the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-06SenateRECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-07Assemblyreferred to transportation
2023-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1522
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-04-18SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A06851 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback