NY S06412 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers of the division of housing and community renewal; authorizes the division in cooperation with the NY housing finance agency, and the NY housing trust fund corporation and its subsidiaries to issue and impose orders, directives and assess actual and pecuniary penalties, or other remedies and relief necessary to assure compliance with the law.
Title
Relates to the powers of the division of housing and community renewal; authorizes the division in cooperation with the NY housing finance agency, and the NY housing trust fund corporation and its subsidiaries to issue and impose orders, directives and assess actual and pecuniary penalties, or other remedies and relief necessary to assure compliance with the law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.460 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1796 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08428 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to housing