NY S06408 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the boundary of the Middletown-Hardenburgh fire district to include the territorial boundaries of the village of Margaretville for the purposes of fire protection.
Title
Extends the boundary of the Middletown-Hardenburgh fire district to include the territorial boundaries of the village of Margaretville for the purposes of fire protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.2 |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.324 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.468 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9111a |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-05-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6408C |
2014-05-07 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-07 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-03-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6408B |
2014-02-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6408A |
2014-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.123 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09111 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6408c