NY S06407 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to transfers of structured settlements; requires the court to appoint a guardian ad litem when the payee of a structured settlement is an infant; requires the court to appoint an independent advisor to counsel the payee of a structured settlement about the terms of the transfer.
Title
Relates to transfers of structured settlements; requires the court to appoint a guardian ad litem when the payee of a structured settlement is an infant; requires the court to appoint an independent advisor to counsel the payee of a structured settlement about the terms of the transfer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1136 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |