NY S06393 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the substitution of brand name epinephrine auto-injectors with alternate epinephrine auto-injectors in certain cases.
Title
Relates to the substitution of brand name epinephrine auto-injectors with alternate epinephrine auto-injectors in certain cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.511 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1137 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03981 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education