NY S06388 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - signed chap.169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - signed chap.169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to enforcement of support obligations through the suspension of driving privileges.
Title
Extends provisions relating to enforcement of support obligations through the suspension of driving privileges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Senate | signed chap.169 |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1374 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6388 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.574 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | referred to social services |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7788 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1374 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07788 (Same As) 2019-08-14 - signed chap.169