NY S06386 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage American eel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage American eel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30AssemblySIGNED CHAP.235
2019-08-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.199
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a7882
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1273
2019-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A07882 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s6386

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback