NY S06386 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - DEFEATED IN CODES
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - DEFEATED IN CODES
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes in the class E felony of vehicular assault in the second degree, the causing of serious physical injury or death to another person, while operating a motor vehicle with a suspended or revoked license, or if he or she is unlicensed.
Title
Includes in the class E felony of vehicular assault in the second degree, the causing of serious physical injury or death to another person, while operating a motor vehicle with a suspended or revoked license, or if he or she is unlicensed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CODES |
2014-03-06 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2014-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08587 (Same As) 2014-01-24 - referred to codes