NY S06385 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes real property taxing jurisdictions to grant a partial tax exemption for property purchased by a physician in a physician shortage area, as determined by the commissioner of health, which will be such physician's primary residence and he or she will practice in such shortage area; provides state aid to taxing jurisdictions which grant the exemption to the extent of the tax savings provided to physicians.
Title
Authorizes real property taxing jurisdictions to grant a partial tax exemption for property purchased by a physician in a physician shortage area, as determined by the commissioner of health, which will be such physician's primary residence and he or she will practice in such shortage area; provides state aid to taxing jurisdictions which grant the exemption to the extent of the tax savings provided to physicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08307 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken